GLOBAL BRIGADES UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to coordinate volunteer efforts and contribute resources to underserved communities to relieve problems caused by poverty, hunger, access to healthcare, public health infrastructure, lack of education, and environmental degradation while preserving such communities' culture, to educate the public and to carry on other charitable activities associated with these goals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
78 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ghana
- Greece
- Honduras
- Nicaragua
- Panama
Governance
- 06 October 2009: Standard registration
- GLOBAL BRIGADES (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Shaswath Ganapathi | Chair | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Maddy-Powell | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Samah Ramsi | Trustee | 28 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nazim Zaim | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jones | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Elizabeth Stubley | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jess Woodrow | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samahat Ahmed | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gianmarco Iannello | Trustee | 27 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.80k | £10.08k | £36.50k | £64.42k | £84.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.66k | £17.01k | £17.83k | £71.79k | £82.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/12/2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY GHANA. HONDURAS AND PANAMA BY: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; (C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; AND (D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. SIGNED:
Area of benefit
GHANA. HONDURAS AND PANAMA
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 St. Lukes Road
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL53 7JH
- Phone:
- 07568166115
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window