PORTISHEAD POOL COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Open Air Swimming Pool in Portishead open to the public, heated through the summer: April until September, and for winter swimming at weekends. It is staffed, maintained and run by volunteers and paid manager & lifeguards
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Somerset
Governance
- 19 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Elizabeth Smith | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Goude | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Amos | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Piggott | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £323.51k | £43.15k | £313.58k | £361.05k | £429.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.84k | £89.45k | £233.40k | £310.90k | £345.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.00k | £31.58k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 21 May 2021 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 22 May 2021 | 107 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958, TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PORTISHEAD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE A NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF SUCH INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Portishead Pool Community Trust
Esplanade Road
Portishead
BRISTOL
BS20 7HD
- Phone:
- 01275 843454
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window