Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHESTERTON ST ANDREW
Charity number: 1130805
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Lawson | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Bick | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amber V A Grantham | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Lewin | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Stollwerck Boulton | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Stark | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Pountain | Trustee | 16 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Lacey | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Quentin Harmer | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julia Eisen | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Josephine Fernie | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robin Newton | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Curry | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL GRANDE | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA JOY ABREY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev DOROTHY HELEN PEYTON JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.