RHUDDLAN TOWN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a hall which is used for many activities, art classes, Welsh classes, music classes, craft classes, slimming clubs, whist and bingo clubs, the hall is used by the community for meetings, parties etc. We keep the costs low to encourage everyone to make use of the hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 08 September 1970: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Butterworth | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Roberts | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Roberts | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Hughes | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pat Riley | Trustee | 04 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
DENISE BARLOW | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Henry Roy william Price | Trustee | 20 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
Gwyn Price | Trustee | 06 November 2008 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Lindsay | Trustee | 05 June 2004 |
|
|
||||
Selwyn Thomas | Trustee | 06 September 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.95k | £15.30k | £13.01k | £23.32k | £27.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.16k | £14.90k | £11.11k | £21.38k | £25.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 September 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 12 JANUARY 1984
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENACE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE OF THE INGABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF RHUDDLAN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEROF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPRVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE TOWN OF RHUDDLAN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rhuddlan Town Community Association
Parliament Street
Rhuddlan
Rhyl
Denbighshire
LL18 5AW
- Phone:
- 01745590656
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window