SHARE PSYCHOTHERAPY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer Individual and Group psychotherapy. We also offer supervision and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £43,470 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 29 June 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Astrid Walker Bourne | Chair | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Finn | Trustee | 12 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julia Yeardley | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Beth Hughes | Trustee | 10 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
RUMBIDZAISHE CHIVAURA | Trustee | 29 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Boddye | Trustee | 17 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.76k | £198.58k | £159.13k | £113.52k | £139.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.83k | £165.26k | £151.67k | £168.04k | £167.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £43.47k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF PSYCHOTHERAPY AND COUNSELLING FOR THOSE WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD IT THROUGH LACK OF MEANS OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHARE PSYCHOTHERAPY
19 PARADISE SQUARE
SHEFFIELD
S1 2DE
- Phone:
- 01142730200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window