Financial history CARSHALTON BEECHES BAPTIST FREE CHURCH

Charity number: 1130318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £288.39k £260.00k £246.24k £256.13k £251.43k
Total expenditure £352.74k £320.58k £304.92k £298.42k £343.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.56k N/A N/A N/A N/A