GONXHE BOJAXHI ALBANIAN UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
'Mother Teresa' Albanian Union is an active user-led organization that runs to advance the education and training of Albanian from Kosovo, Macedonia, Albania, Montenegro in the UK particularly in London. Enable them to take active roles in their communities, providing advice and help them find training and employment, healthy living, educationally disadvantaged children, young people, women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 02 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 07 November 2009: Standard registration
- 'MOTHER TERESA' ALBANIAN UNION (Working name)
- 'MOTHER TERESA' ALBANIAN UNION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zamira Ruspi | Chair | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ardjana Lalaj mrs | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aqif Neli | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Agim Krasniqi | Trustee | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
HANKE CECJA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAKOLI KUJTIM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LILJANA HOXHA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAVDIE LACI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 02/07/2019 | 02/07/2020 | 02/07/2021 | 02/07/2022 | 02/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.89k | £500 | £1.20k | £10.00k | £3.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.37k | £300 | £0 | £6.58k | £1.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 02 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 6 days | |
Annual return | 02 July 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 July 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 02 July 2020 | 03 June 2021 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 28 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BRENT, NORTH WEST LONDON AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCE WITH OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
BRENT, NORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 15
Victoria Mansions
Grange Road
London
NW10 2RG
- Phone:
- 07584728069
- Email:
- motherteresa42@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window