CLOUGH FARM ANIMAL SANCTUARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE SHELTER, FOOD,CARE FOR FARM ANIMALS FROM RSPCA & ANIMAL HOSPITAL,REHOMING AS MANY AS POSSIBLE. DISABLED, SPECIAL NEEDS CHILDREN, YOUTH OFFENDERS DO REPARATION WORK AND VISIT. ENCOURAGE RIGHT PRACTICES OF HEALTHY DIET AND CORRECT HANDLING. BROWNIEGROUPS CARRY OUT THEIR ANIMAL CARE BADGES,DUKE OF EDINBURGH SERVICE AWARDS. LOCAL COLLEGES AND SCHOOLS DO WORK EXPERIENCE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Stockport
Governance
- 30 November 2009: Standard registration
- 09 October 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- CLOUGH FARM PONY SANCTUARY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.10k | £14.84k | £11.60k | £15.42k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.21k | £13.32k | £11.84k | £12.21k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 01 March 2018 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 24 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 OCTOBER 2009 AND 29 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window