ELLEN MACARTHUR FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a vision and framework for the transition towards a restorative economy - the circular economy. To focus our activities in three areas. Education - Inspiring a generation to re-think, re-design and build a positive future; Business - Catalysing business innovation for a circular economy;. Insight - Creating a tipping point for a circular economy through thought leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£20,787,086
Donations and legacies | £13.74m | |
Charitable activities | £7.96k | |
Other trading activities | £6.92m | |
Investments | £111.20k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£21,361,643
Raising funds | £354.59k | |
Charitable activities | £15.91m | |
Other | £5.09m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.45m | |
Charitable expenditure | £15.91m |
People

187 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 13 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 4 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
£200k to £250k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Isle Of Wight
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 June 2009: Standard registration
- EMF (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hema Patel | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lebovitz | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PETER MORGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAME ELLEN MACARTHUR | Trustee |
|
||||||
PHILIP SELLWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.35m | £12.51m | £18.14m | £17.39m | £20.79m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.76m | £11.57m | £14.60m | £16.07m | £21.36m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £12.86m | £8.28m | £13.63m | £11.56m | £13.74m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £3.45m | £4.19m | £4.50m | £5.83m | £6.92m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.57k | £17.00k | £10.00k | £8.00k | £7.96k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £24.78k | £18.00k | £4.00k | £6.00k | £111.20k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.55m | £8.82m | £11.64m | £12.51m | £15.91m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £142.69k | £353.00k | £151.00k | £301.00k | £354.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £91.00k | £86.00k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £70.03k | £2.40m | £2.81m | £3.26m | £5.09m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £340.78k | £644.00k | £751.00k | £382.00k | £698.68k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £15.90m | £20.53m | £24.23m | £20.23m | £26.59m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.72m | £3.41m | £3.75m | £1.57m | £5.48m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 03 September 2020 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROMOTE STUDY AND RESEARCH IN SUCH SUBJECTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SAIL LOFT
42 MEDINA ROAD
COWES
PO31 7BX
- Phone:
- 01983296463
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window