Financial history YORK HOUSE OFFICERS' MESS RAF CRANWELL

Charity number: 1129828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £64.92k £54.60k £87.48k £133.91k £104.65k
Total expenditure £67.72k £27.48k £81.49k £134.94k £125.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A