Accounts and annual returns DAEDALUS OFFICERS' MESS RAF CRANWELL

Charity number: 1129827
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 26 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 26 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 28 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 28 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 06 October 2023 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 06 October 2023 189 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

30 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window