THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF FAWKHAM AND HARTLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP OPEN TO ALL. PROVISON OF SACRED SPACE FOR PERSONAL PRAYER AND CONTEMPLATION. PASTORAL WORK INCLUDING VISITING THE SICK & BEREAVED. TEACHING OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH SERMONS COURSE AND SMALL GROUPS. TAKING RELIGIOUS ASSEMBLIES IN SCHOOLS. PROVISION OF A YOUTH CLUB WITH CHRISTIAN ETHOS. PROMOTION OF CHRISTIANITY THROUGH EVENTS, MEETINGS & DITRIBUTING CHRISTIAN LITERATURE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 28 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- FAWKHAM&HARTLEYPCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISTAIR GRAHAM ROBERTSON | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
carole ann harris | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jocelyn Rachel Walker | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|||||
FREDERICK GEORGE GRAINGER | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev elizabeth mary robertson | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise April Chick-Smith | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAROL LESLEY STONE | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||
gillian alice ann cramp | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|||||
FRANCES MARY KINNEAR | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
amanda yvonne malas | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
carol linda ballard | Trustee | 21 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.18k | £77.25k | £73.28k | £92.82k | £93.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.67k | £94.56k | £72.02k | £63.25k | £90.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ABERG-WAUN
STACK LANE
HARTLEY
LONGFIELD
DA3 8BL
- Phone:
- 01474704175
- Email:
- BRIANJELLEY@AOL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window