THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OUNDLE WITH ASHTON

Charity number: 1132677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Peter's Church is a community of people seeking to follow Jesus Christ. Our purpose is to demonstrate the love of God in word and action to the people of Oundle and the world beyond. We seek to partner with others who share this aim in the Diocese, the nation and the world. Schools work, youth groups, dementia care, discussion groups, mission giving, foodbank are just some key core activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £319,289
Total expenditure: £306,626

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PETER'S PCC, OUNDLE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Stephen Jeremy Webster Chair
CHURCH LAND
Received: On time
WILLIAM WALCOT'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
OUNDLE CHURCH CLOCK FUND
Received: On time
SIR WILLIAM LAXTON'S PENSION CHARITY
Received: On time
PARSON LATHAM'S HOSPITAL IN OUNDLE
Received: On time
Louisa Baker Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Robert Dillarstone Trustee 12 May 2024
CHRISTIAN BLIND MISSION (UNITED KINGDOM) LIMITED
Received: On time
John Grubb Trustee 12 May 2024
None on record
Claire Rose Weston Trustee 14 May 2023
None on record
SARAH JANE VOGT Trustee 15 May 2022
PRINCE WILLIAM SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Benjamin Tudor Elliot Treverton LLB MTeach Trustee 15 May 2022
None on record
Peter John Taylor Trustee 23 November 2021
None on record
Louise Foote Trustee 12 May 2021
PARSON LATHAM'S HOSPITAL IN OUNDLE
Received: On time
Pamela Weatherington Trustee 12 May 2021
THE FRIENDS OF OUNDLE PARISH CHURCH 2016
Received: On time
Angela Clare Newell Trustee 12 May 2021
None on record
Rev Annabel Susan Mary Copeland Trustee 29 November 2020
None on record
Sian Fytche Trustee 03 October 2019
OUNDLE CHURCH CLOCK FUND
Received: On time
WILLIAM WALCOT'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
David Frank Gooda Trustee 07 April 2019
THE FRIENDS OF OUNDLE PARISH CHURCH 2016
Received: On time
Sally-Anne Michaela Saunders Trustee 18 March 2018
None on record
Kim Treverton Trustee 28 March 2017
None on record
IAN CHRISTOPHER GOLDSMITH Trustee 12 April 2016
THE FRIENDS OF OUNDLE PARISH CHURCH 2016
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £344.21k £351.52k £242.33k £467.11k £319.29k
Total expenditure £380.67k £249.93k £260.92k £301.37k £306.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.55k £12.57k £18.90k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 14 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 May 2021 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 May 2021 195 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Parish Office
St. Peters Church
North Street
Oundle
PETERBOROUGH
PE8 4AL
Phone:
01832275675