BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BESIDES THE USUAL CHURCH SERVICES, WE PROVIDE A LOT OF ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. WE PROVIDE CLUBS FOR PARENTS AND TODDLERS, CHILDREN, YOUTH, OLDER PEOPLE, ALL OF WHICH ARE OPEN TO EVERYONE. WE ALSO ALLOW OUR BUILDINGS TO BE USED BY VARIOUS COMMUNITY GROUPS AND FAMILIES FOR VARIOUS ACTIVITIES THAT HELP AND SUPPORT OTHERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cardiff
Governance
- 13 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JONATHAN PAUL VAUGHAN-DAVIES BTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Stephen Pettit | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Vernon | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Downs | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Plummer | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gibbs | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rock | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luther Vaughan | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Farewell | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Ann Roberts | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Stroemer | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hodges | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.22k | £117.34k | £121.58k | £119.16k | £132.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.02k | £126.29k | £124.52k | £121.58k | £123.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH
PENLLINE ROAD
CARDIFF
CF14 2AA
- Phone:
- 02920522113
- Email:
- office@bethelcardiff.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window