Trustees BETHEL BAPTIST CHURCH
Charity Number: 1132093

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JONATHAN PAUL VAUGHAN-DAVIES BTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Stephen Pettit | Trustee | 03 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Vernon | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Downs | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Plummer | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Gibbs | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rock | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Luther Vaughan | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Farewell | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Ann Roberts | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Stroemer | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hodges | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.