PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, PRIMROSE HILL WITH ST PAUL, AVENUE RD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship in the catholic tradition of the Church of England, good music, and a concern for people of all ages. With our church school, St Paul's, we strive to reach out to local families. We have a thriving Sunday School and an imaginative youthwork programme. Our Social Inclusion Programme aims is to build positive relationships with local young people at risk of social exclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
Governance
- 13 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- 20 September 2022: Funds received from 1078655 THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY THE VIRGIN CHURCH, PRIMROS...
- PCC OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, PRIMROSE HILL (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Simon James Ritchie | Chair | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucinda Ferelith Smith | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Anny-Aleida Van Woudenberg | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Mary du Vivier | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ann Davidson | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Campbell Gilmour | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Margaret Jane Carter | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|||||
John Hellinikakis | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ross Stephan Gilmour | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roderick William James Monroe | Trustee | 24 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
TED RUSCOE | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE ROSE GRACE HEDGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMANDA MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £312.54k | £326.06k | £371.21k | £370.29k | £281.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £329.71k | £367.63k | £344.30k | £322.74k | £329.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £56.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Mary the Virgin C of E Church
Elsworthy Road
London
NW3 3DJ
- Phone:
- 020 7722 3238
- Email:
- office@smvph.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window