THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY MAGDALENE, YARM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Promoting Christianity through staging of events and meetings and the distribution of literature. Promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,623 from 1 government grant(s)
People

22 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 22 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY MAGDALENE PCC, YARM (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
22 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Darren Richard Moore | Chair | 12 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Gregory | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Finlay | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Susan Ellis | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Kate Mary Brown | Trustee | 19 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Storar Gaitskell | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Elizabeth Beckwith | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Stephanie Brackenbury | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Allison | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Louise Nadin | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Clare Parker | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Patricia Meeking | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
PETER MONCK | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Local | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROS CARLING | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET NICHOLLS | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARION JOHNSTON | Trustee | 09 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
AVRIL MARY RHODES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
David William Yates | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARTIN JOHN HUGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELAINE HUGGINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr John Christopher Rhodes | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.15k | £79.55k | £110.23k | £157.75k | £134.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.24k | £89.38k | £86.13k | £115.32k | £205.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.51k | N/A | N/A | £2.43k | £10.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 CLOCKWOOD GARDENS
YARM
TS15 9RW
- Phone:
- 01642780944
- Email:
- yarmchurch@yarmchurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window