THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WILFRID, HAYWARDS HEATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, inc visiting sick/bereaved. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses, baptism, toddler and other groups. Taking of religious assemblies in local CoE school. Promoting whole mission of Church Supporting other charities in UK/Overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £918 from 3 government grant(s)
People

13 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 30 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST WILFRIDS PCC, HAYWARDS HEATH (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Edward Robert Pritchett | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Rev Carolyn Jane Scott | Trustee | 25 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Anthony David | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Downie | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Gooding | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Arnold | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LAURA SAYERS | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Pamela Nancy Kendall | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
SALLY KATHLEEN WARD | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BLAIR STOREY | Trustee | 13 September 2011 |
|
|||||
KAREN JOYCE MICHAEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS PRUE RICHARDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN MACLEOD MICHAEL MA LLB BSc | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.02k | £149.61k | £151.11k | £138.17k | £150.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.72k | £225.94k | £160.88k | £125.36k | £126.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.28k | N/A | £7.28k | N/A | £918 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O ST WILFRID'S PARISH OFFICE
ST WILFRID'S WAY
HAYWARDS HEATH
WEST SUSSEX
RH16 3QH
- Phone:
- 07906 272762
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window