THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST FRANCIS, SALISBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral working including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching of Christianity. Taking of religious assemblies in schools. Provision of youth activities. Provision of activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers and other groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 12 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST FRANCIS PCC, SALISBURY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jean Helier Thomson De Garis | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joseph Stone | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Coggan-Lennox | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Liz Liversage | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Inglis | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Mary Terry | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA LISTRA POLIUS | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Roger Neve | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Karen Louise Scott | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Helen Malone | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Thomas Alexander Wilkins | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Alford | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher David Taylor | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Venables | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev SARAH ELIZABETH WOOD-ROE | Trustee | 13 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jean Alexis Filtness | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEITH JOHN LESLIE | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN TERENCE WEBB | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
SALLY REED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £383.68k | £270.98k | £255.61k | £271.72k | £279.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £372.11k | £250.14k | £252.53k | £255.22k | £248.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 November 2024 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 November 2024 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Francis Church
Beatrice Road
Salisbury
Wiltshire
SP1 3PN
- Phone:
- 01722413644
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window