PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF CHRIST CHURCH WESTBOURNE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the whole mission of the church. Its activities reflect these objects in a variety of different ways
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bournemouth
Governance
- 21 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARSH OF CHRIST CHURCH WESTBOURNE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev NICHOLAS ROBIN THOMAS HISCOCKS | Chair | 08 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Melanie Grace Hosken | Trustee | 14 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Harrison | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Clemson | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nikos Yianni | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Alan Fentiman | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Clare Dobson | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Stewart Greaves | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Andrew May | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Russell Alan Coxon | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £334.10k | £357.16k | £356.04k | £297.72k | £373.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £339.88k | £451.94k | £295.94k | £326.61k | £315.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 21 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church
Alumhurst Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH4 8ER
- Phone:
- 01202760952
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window