MESSIAH COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To worship and serve God fulfilling the Great Commission of Jesus Christ as set forth in Matthew 28:19-20. To minister to the needs of the members and others as the church is able to do so. To provide schools and colleges for the secular and spiritual education of mankind. To provide a place of refuge for abandon children and further shelters and accommodation for those in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- MESSIAH CHURCH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIE AUGUSTA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLORIA APPIYAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONNA GARDENER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.77k | £12.17k | £14.57k | £36.33k | £29.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.47k | £10.48k | £15.42k | £36.55k | £30.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10 APR 2020
Charitable objects
The objects of the Church (¶the Objects÷) are for the benefit of the public: (a) to advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Statement in such ways and in such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Church Council from time to time may think fit; (b) to relieve sickness and financial hardship and to promote and preserve good health by the provision of funds, goods or services of any kind including through the provision of counselling and support in such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Church Council from time to time think fit; and (c) to advance education in such ways and in such parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the Church Council form time to time may think fit.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MESSIAH CHURCH
PO BOX 60912
LONDON
W12 0UU
- Phone:
- 02087434987
- Email:
- info@messiahchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window