Financial history Creation Adventure Sports Ltd

Charity number: 1131084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £135.00k £232.48k £297.55k £371.28k £424.71k
Total expenditure £120.96k £207.81k £308.96k £365.52k £426.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £22.40k £75.66k £6.00k £6.00k £61.93k