THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S, HADDENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Traditional and modern church services ÔÇô childrenÔÇÖs church ÔÇô activities for young people ÔÇô outreach in local community and schools ÔÇô alternative expression of church (Caf+® plus) in Village Hall once per month ÔÇô support to local, national and international charities ÔÇô home groups and Monday Fellowship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 26 October 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARY'S PCC, HADDENHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Cassandra Messervy | Chair | 22 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Alison Joyce Bisset | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Thomas William Elston | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Vanessa Elston | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Timothy Eric Shaw | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Peter Goves | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTOPHER NURSE | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Julie Fell | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Howard Charles Roberts | Trustee | 08 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Paul Smith | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Gordon Douglas McCallum Lawson | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
REV Philip Neil Groves | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||
VALERIE WALKER | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Rev JONATHAN DESMOND HAWKINS | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
TRISH MANDER | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||||
LORAINE ANNE MILMER | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
CHRISTINE PAMELA HEADLONG | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||||
DIANNE BRACKLEY BSC | Trustee | 01 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.72k | £133.51k | £141.34k | £152.50k | £181.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.35k | £146.21k | £144.14k | £128.48k | £157.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Centre
Station Road
Haddenham
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP17 8AJ
- Phone:
- 01844 291108
- Email:
- office@haddenhamstmarys.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window