THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF RUSHDEN WHITEFRIARS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship open to all. Pastoral work. Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Providing a youth ministry with a Christian ethos. Providing a range of mentoring activities. Promoting the whole mission of the church through provision of a range of activities. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 24 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- WHITEFRIARS CHURCH PCC, RUSHDEN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Croxon | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Chadwick | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Kenneth Owst | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Gibson | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Benn | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynda King | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nisha Slater | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Croxon | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Holman | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Leanne Barker | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Smith | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Holley | Trustee | 19 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CELIA ANN UNDERWOOD | Trustee | 11 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
MELVYN DOUGLAS HUNTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CANON ANDREW ROY PRESLAND BSC HONS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.84k | £147.29k | £111.70k | £125.84k | £161.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.04k | £122.70k | £111.98k | £124.27k | £134.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 FIRST AVENUE
WELLINGBOROUGH
NN8 3PT
- Phone:
- 01933 312270
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window