THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DANBURY ST JOHN BAPTIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public worship open to all, a sacred place for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and bereaved. Teaching and promotion of Christianity through sermons, courses, groups, events, together with activities for parents and toddlers and special needs groups. Supporting other charities in the UK and abroad. Maintaining the historic Church building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 23 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- DANBURY ST JOHN BAPTIST PCC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jacqui Jones | Chair | 28 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Priestley | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joan Graham | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sylvia Hennem | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janine Archer | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Alan Roger Dixon | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Walton | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Baddely Arthurs | Trustee | 15 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Ian Cooper | Trustee | 06 April 2014 |
|
|||||
ALISON COOPER | Trustee | 08 May 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.06k | £84.72k | £90.01k | £115.04k | £104.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.27k | £79.79k | £88.16k | £94.23k | £109.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 November 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 BEAUMONT PARK
DANBURY
CHELMSFORD
CM3 4DE
- Phone:
- 07966 266256
- Email:
- alanrdixon@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window