THE OFFICERS' MESS FUND, COMMANDO TRAINING CENTRE ROYAL MARINES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's object *the Object) is " the promotion of efficiency of the armed forces fo the Crown by the provision and support of faciclities and activities for the efficiency and well-being of Service personnel".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 18 June 2009: Standard registration
- THE OFFICERS' MESS CTCRM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Colonel Thomas Mathew Evans-Jones | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.59k | £72.07k | £77.23k | £137.45k | £168.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £197.39k | £50.42k | £82.61k | £148.23k | £166.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/03/2013
Charitable objects
The charity's object (the object) is 'the promotion of efficiency of the armed forces of the Crown by the provision and support of facilities and activities for the efficiency and well-being of service personnel'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMANDO TRAINING CENTRE
ROYAL MARINES
EXMOUTH ROAD
LYMPSTONE
EXMOUTH
EX8 5AR
- Phone:
- 01392414104
- Email:
- laird.webster339@mod.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window