THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY'S NORTH MYMMS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

18 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 10 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- PCC OF ST MARY'S CHURCH NORTH MYMMS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Ruth Barr | Chair | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Rev Sara Head | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Theresa Parker | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian L Peplow | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
KAREN JANE HOPKINS | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Findlay Boulton | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Stanley Jackson | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Penelope Jane Thomson | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Hamilton Sinclair Crake | Trustee | 14 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Large | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Byron Stephen Hopkins | Trustee | 30 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Joan Davis | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM LEONARD NICHOLAS | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Rupert Christopher Penfold Lee | Trustee | 20 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Sherlock | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dorothy Crawley | Trustee | 27 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY GUY BOOTHBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER SKEVINGTON DALLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.10k | £116.44k | £123.50k | £141.66k | £138.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.92k | £137.72k | £134.38k | £140.74k | £135.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.20k | £2.30k | £2.35k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Marys Church
North Mymms park
Hatfield
Hertfordshire
AL9 7TN
- Phone:
- 01727825578
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window