THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST NICHOLAS, CODSALL, STAFFORDSHIRE IN THE DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD

Charity Number: 1130892
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing facilities for public worship, pastoral care and spiritual, moral and intellectual development, both for its members and for anyone who wishes to benefit from what the Church offers: and Promoting Christian values, and service by members of the Church in and to their communities, to the benefit of individuals and society as a whole.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £139,667
Total expenditure: £153,081

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • CODSALL PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Margaret Mattocks Chair 16 September 2018
None on record
Marie Spencer Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Val Chapman Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Brenda Davis Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Janice Elizabeth Symonds Trustee 10 May 2022
CODSALL CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE CHARLES WROTTESLEY
Received: On time
Tim West Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Helen Walker Trustee 25 May 2021
None on record
Annie Fletcher Trustee 27 October 2020
None on record
Jonathan Marsh Trustee 27 October 2020
None on record
Tracy Carver Trustee 27 October 2020
None on record
Brigid O'Connor Trustee 30 April 2019
None on record
Mrs Jill Gollins Trustee 25 April 2016
None on record
SERENA GILMOUR Trustee 05 August 2013
None on record
SUSAN MARILYN LOUISA CARTWRIGHT Trustee 20 July 2011
CODSALL CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE CHARLES WROTTESLEY
Received: On time
HAZEL MAY BRISTOW Trustee 20 July 2011
CODSALL CHARITIES
Received: On time
David John Oliver Carver Trustee
CODSALL CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE HONOURABLE CHARLES WROTTESLEY
Received: On time
MRS JACKIE MORGANS Trustee
None on record
ROGER BECKETT MARSH B MET Trustee
MERCIAN COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
EVELYN JENNIFER WALLIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £384.98k £201.93k £128.37k £168.45k £139.67k
Total expenditure £183.69k £175.96k £149.36k £134.70k £153.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Parish Rooms
Church Road
Codsall
Staffordshire
WV8 1EH
Phone:
01902847786