HOOFBEATS EQUINE REHABILITATION SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer a safe, equine friendly centre for recovery, retraining and rehoming of Horses and Ponies. Our primary aim is to re-home our friends with suitable human companions on a permanent loan basis off-site (typically in the south-west of the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 December 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON ELIZABETH VIEIRA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SAMANTHA HOCKING | Trustee | 18 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.09k | £18.56k | £14.71k | £14.47k | £15.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.00k | £18.28k | £14.69k | £14.18k | £15.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF EQUINES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION IN PARTICULAR BY RESCUE, REHABILITATION AND REHOMEING OR BY THE PROVISION OR MAINTENANCE, OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF STABLES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF EQUINES WHO ARE UNWANTED OR RETIRED OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE WELFARE OF EQUINES AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG SUCH EQUINES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farmyard Cafe
Wotter
PLYMOUTH
PL7 5HR
- Phone:
- 07711583985
- Email:
- SHARON@HOOFBEATS.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window