THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST MARY AND ST PAUL HEMEL HEMPSTEAD

Charity number: 1130644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Established Church. Regular Public worship open to all, Pastoral work including visiting the sick and the bereaved and promoting the whole mission of the Church through provision of activities for senior citizens , parents and toddlers and other groups.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £115,508
Total expenditure: £116,073

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST MARY AND ST PAUL PCC HEMEL HEMPSTEAD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Keith Williams Chair 01 April 2017
FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARNABAS ADEYFIELD HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Received: On time
Sheila Dorothy Barton Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Dr Alan Younger Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Mojisola Bamidele Aguda Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Jane Louise Lynskey Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Malcolm Edmund Taylor Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Kemp Trustee 28 April 2024
None on record
ROGER MILTON SYGRAVE Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Opeyemi Olubusola Wilde-Halim Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Brian Crawley Trustee 25 April 2021
None on record
Lindsay Michael Peter Kemp Trustee 04 October 2020
None on record
Rosamund Anne Russell BSc MRTPI Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Emmeline Mary Lambert Trustee 17 April 2016
FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S CHURCH HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
Received: On time
Rev Luke Geoghegan Trustee 20 September 2014
None on record
Gordon Gaddes Trustee 21 April 2014
THE UK LANGA TOWNSHIP PRE-SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
YVONNE ELIZABETH DORAN Trustee 18 April 2011
None on record
ROSINA LOUISA Gaddes Trustee
THE UK LANGA TOWNSHIP PRE-SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £109.75k £228.09k £140.72k £109.00k £115.51k
Total expenditure £113.65k £207.52k £155.27k £108.19k £116.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £17.88k £6.71k £400 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Parish Office
St. Marys Hall
High Street
HEMEL HEMPSTEAD
HP1 3AF
Phone:
07901359117