Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY'S, OVERTON, DIOCESE OF WINCHESTER
Charity number: 1130067

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Mary Peters | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Barker | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Spencer | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Benjamin Smith | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Bruce Williams | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Emily Soane | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Geoffrey Francis | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christopher Joseph Cates | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ian James Boreham | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
RUTH ANN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER ALAN SILVERWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.