OUSTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a Community Resource Centre for the people of Ouston through which individuals of all ages, and community groups, will have access to meeting spaces, advice, information and guidance, educational, social and leisure opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £32,864 from 9 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
89 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 29 July 2009: Standard registration
- OCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALISON JOAN BATEY MRS | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
KAREN JULIA FAIRBAIRN | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
PAUL KENNETH MCFARLING | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
CLARE MARSHALL | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|||||
david michael nichols | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE ELAINE WATSON | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
AUDREY STEPHENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.00k | £68.81k | £56.44k | £74.26k | £89.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.99k | £53.39k | £47.35k | £77.40k | £93.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.58k | £24.02k | £23.59k | £32.86k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
A TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF OUSTON WITHOUT THE DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS B TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF OUSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ouston Community Centre
Iris Crescent
Ouston
Chester le Street
DH2 1RJ
- Phone:
- 0191 4105183
- Email:
- info@oustoncc.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window