WE ARE MUSIC LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide engagement in popular music for young people across Tendring and Essex in what are primarily deprived areas. We also operate other programmes helping emerging artists understand routes into the music industry, work placements and internships. We also work with young people in live sound and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £14,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Standard registration
- ROCK SCHOOL CLUB HARWICH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER SCOTT | Chair | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ross Kemp | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amber Scott | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Patrick McCann | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.42k | £62.00k | £52.11k | £95.92k | £110.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.85k | £64.44k | £55.07k | £80.95k | £89.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 25 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/07/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/02/2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH - A THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE B PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 QUEEN STREET
GREAT OAKLEY
HARWICH
CO12 5AS
- Phone:
- 07907414611
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window