THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREWS, OLD HEADINGTON

Charity Number: 1131302
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all.The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work including visiting the sick and bereaved.Teaching of Christianity through sermons, confirmation classes and other small groups.Taking of religious assemblies in St Andrews School. We gave £10,561 to various national and international charities in 2018.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £105,202
Total expenditure: £141,128

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST ANDREW'S PCC, OLD HEADINGTON (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Bennett Trustee 26 May 2024
LONDON GYPSIES AND TRAVELLERS
Received: On time
Natalie Sawer Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Benjamin McManus Trustee 26 May 2024
None on record
Dr Susan Fenley Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Dr Megan Dent Trustee 07 May 2023
None on record
Julie Ifill Trustee 11 October 2021
None on record
Rev Luke Norman Trustee 03 July 2021
None on record
Nigel Voak Trustee 27 June 2021
None on record
Peter Stanley McCarter Trustee 27 June 2021
COMMONWEALTH FORESTRY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH,HEADINGTON
Received: On time
Dr Jane Ellen Elizabeth Shepherd Trustee 14 April 2019
FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH,HEADINGTON
Received: On time
Rupert Fogden Trustee 21 May 2018
None on record
Malcolm Nichols Trustee 13 May 2018
FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH,HEADINGTON
Received: On time
NATACHA FERNANDE HUGGETT Trustee 21 August 2012
FRIENDS OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH,HEADINGTON
Received: On time
RICHARD GLEDHILL Trustee
HEADINGTON PARISH CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £133.44k £96.44k £102.99k £163.15k £105.20k
Total expenditure £102.24k £98.99k £110.64k £217.66k £141.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE VICARAGE
33 St. Andrews Road
Headington
OXFORD
OX3 9DL
Phone:
01865761094