THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KING CHARLES THE MARTYR FALMOUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
KCM Falmouth holds monthly Family services in the church which are great fun. The Choir holds regular concerts and we welcome visitors all year round from around the world. KCM has a very popular coffee shop which brings the community together. The Church Hall is now more accessible to everyone and is used for a great many groups etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 03 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Susan Davies | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Richard Rogers | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Rosebeth Snell | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Gibson Grenfell | Trustee | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Arthur Horton | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT JOHN MARTIN | Trustee | 28 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.20k | £111.99k | £78.34k | £85.38k | £113.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.36k | £59.07k | £90.28k | £101.82k | £92.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 January 2024 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 January 2024 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2024 | 450 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 January 2024 | 450 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2021 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 May 2021 | 202 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
King Charles the Martyr Church
33 Church Street
Falmouth
Cornwall
TR11 3EQ
- Phone:
- 01326219246
- Email:
- wstuartwhite@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window