THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FINCHLEY

Charity Number: 1131595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Regular public worship open to all. The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved, Teaching of Christianity through sermons, courses and small groups. Taking of religious assembles in schools. The provision of a youth club and toddler group with a Christian ethos. Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £489,763
Total expenditure: £233,492

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 September 2009: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST. MARY-AT-FINCHLEY PCC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE REVEREND PHILIP ANTHONY DAVISON Chair
CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Received: On time
Dr Patience Pelham Hazeley Trustee 23 May 2023
None on record
Clement Obi Okoye Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
SMITA BORA Trustee 23 April 2023
CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Received: On time
Nicholas Anthony Upton Trustee 23 April 2023
CHARITY FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Received: On time
Lindsay Elizabeth Hettrick Trustee 23 April 2023
None on record
Rev Francesco Aresco Trustee 11 September 2022
None on record
Abigail Iquo Stanley Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
KARYN RAY Trustee 25 April 2021
NEW END SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Received: 3 days late
Julian Blackett Trevelyan Trustee 18 October 2020
None on record
Peter Fredric Boustred LLB Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Dr Ayoola Oladeji Makanjuola MRCGP LLM Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Barbara Crosbie Trustee 26 April 2015
None on record
CLAIRE BARBARA DISBREY Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
HELEN BEVAN Trustee 25 May 2013
None on record
NIGEL DENIS WILDISH JP BA Trustee
None on record
JEFFREY PETER NETTLETON BA FCA Trustee
None on record
PATRICIA IRIS BAGSTER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £383.06k £198.00k £210.22k £213.73k £489.76k
Total expenditure £314.73k £188.60k £194.29k £221.25k £233.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.80k N/A £145.25k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 January 2024 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 January 2024 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys At Finchley
Parish Office
26 Hendon Lane
LONDON
N3 1TR
Phone:
02082483818