LION WALK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a local congregation of the United Reformed Church, Lion Walk URC seeks to advance the Christian religion through its activities by providing facilities offered to the community and by promoting and hosting concerts and other events of religious and cultural interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 19 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
- LION WALK URC (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Brooks | Chair | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DIANE OSHISANWO | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Lynda Barnes | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Tilley | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Nicholson | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Ray | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Freestone | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hurford | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abimbola Oshisanwo | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Serena Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.56k | £176.16k | £156.08k | £207.86k | £187.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.95k | £170.06k | £158.78k | £208.18k | £212.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUSTS DISTILLED FROM THE UNITED REFORM CHURCH ACTS OF PARLIAMENT (1971 AND 1982) AND THE SCHEME OF UNION (1972)
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity is the advancement of the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the Scheme of Union of the United Reformed Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
United Church
9 Lion Walk
COLCHESTER
CO1 1LX
- Phone:
- 01206574573
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window