Trustees LION WALK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Charity number: 1132811

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Brooks | Chair | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
DIANE OSHISANWO | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Lynda Barnes | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jean Tilley | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carol Nicholson | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Ray | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Freestone | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Hurford | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abimbola Oshisanwo | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Serena Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.