MERCY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mercy and its members are please with the Group's achievements over the last 12 months : Supported orphans institution in Bangladesh Provided education support to children and young people. Provided advice and information to disadvantaged people on employment. Supported people suffer from domestic violence and family problems. Helped poor people for medication and shelter.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Bangladesh
- Ethiopia
- India
Governance
- 27 August 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED FARID AHMED CHOWDHURY | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
MUHAMMAD HASAN CHOWDHURY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MOHAMMED HUSSAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £871 | £860 | £950 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £720 | £750 | £900 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 361 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 361 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 727 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 727 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 February 2023 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 22 August 2021 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 March 2021 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEE MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") A) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN THE UK AND BANGLADESH, ANY ANYWHERE ELSE IN THE WORLD, BY PROVIDING TEACHERS, CLASSES, ACADEMIC RESOURCES AND EQUIPMENT, AWARDING SPONSORSHIP AND SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCE. B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, IN PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN BANGLADESH, BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
THE UK AND BANGLADESH,
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Clements Avenue
LONDON
E16 3AA
- Phone:
- 07956684697
- Email:
- admin@havemercy.org.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.HAVEMERCY.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window