WIVELISCOMBE AREA PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a community transport service for those who are in need of such a service because of age, sickness, disability or financial need or because of a lack of availability of adequate and safe public passenger services in the area surrounding the town of Wiveliscombe, Somerset. Provision of support services for the residents of the town of Wiveliscombe, Somerset and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,710 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Somerset
Governance
- 25 November 2009: Standard registration
- WIVEYLINK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Jean Homeshaw | Chair | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Froud | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brett Adshead | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Forbes Michie | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Measures | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Hurry | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Ewan Robertson | Trustee | 12 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW SMITH | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.88k | £124.92k | £122.33k | £134.82k | £145.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.49k | £100.90k | £138.70k | £142.17k | £168.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £29.71k | £65.06k | £29.71k | £29.71k | £29.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 February 2024 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/05/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/02/2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE THE ENHANCEMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND AMENITY OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT 2 TO PROVIDE, IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC AMENITIES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT 3 TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROVIDING OR FACILITATING THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED 4 TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL NEED OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES 5 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS 6 TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, LAND OR INFRASTRUCTURE FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS, TRAINING AND INFORMATION 7 THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT 8 THE PREVENTION OF CRIME IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY PROMOTING COOPERATION BETWEEN THE PUBLIC AND THE POLICE IN THESE OBJECTS, 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT' MEANS THE TEN PARISHES COMPRISING WIVELISCOMBE, HUISH CHAMPFLOWER, MILVERTON, STAWLEY, CLATWORTHY, BROMPTON RALEGH, CHIPSTABLE, FITZHEAD, BATHEALTON AND ASHBRITTLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Area of benefit
WIVELISCOMBE, HUISH CHAMPFLOWER, MILVERTON, STAWLEY, CLATWORTHY, BROMPTON RALEGH, CHIPSTABLE, FITZHEAD, BATHEALTON AND ASHBRITTLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
WIVELISCOMBE AREA COMMUNITY OFFICE
WIVELISCOMBE HOUSE
3 THE SQUARE
WIVELISCOMBE
TAUNTON
TA4 2JT
- Phone:
- 01984624777
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window