THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF KEIGHLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Place of Worship and activities include pastoral care and support of congregation, outreach and support of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £28,315 from 4 government grant(s)
People

19 Trustee(s)
130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
Governance
- 23 June 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST MARK'S P.C.C. UTLEY (Previous name)
- THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF UTLEY SAINT MARK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Cansdale | Chair | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Amy Victoria Berry | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Mulcock | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Parfitt | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Alastair Kirk | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Racheal Jane Mulcock | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amiri Agbai | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cora King | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Rose | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Carter | Trustee | 23 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carl Robert Pybus | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Helliwell | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Meredith | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Natasha Thomas | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
ANGELA MARY THOMSON | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS ANYHEA JANE FOY | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Malcolm Stuart Foy BA MA MED | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Tracey Ann Raistrick | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
REV JOHN MICHAEL INESON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £327.38k | £362.14k | £387.01k | £364.90k | £405.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £349.22k | £345.30k | £383.45k | £374.46k | £395.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | £12.10k | £28.32k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8-10 North Street
KEIGHLEY
BD21 3SE
- Phone:
- 01535607003
- Email:
- office@keighleyparish.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window