Accounts and annual returns BATH CENTRAL UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1130339
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 February 2025 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 February 2025 468 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 February 2025 468 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window