LINCOLN BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday public worship services Youth clubs and activities during week Mid-week luncheon club for seniors Provision of premises for Lincs County Council Children's Services Network of mid-week bible study and pastoral care groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 13 July 2009: Standard registration
- LBC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Daniel Pollin | Trustee | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicholas Arthur Hasnip | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Housham | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ola Ogunyemi | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Windle | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARION JAYNE WATSON | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.78k | £149.46k | £201.79k | £253.56k | £145.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £142.76k | £122.42k | £212.70k | £88.49k | £180.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £23.00k | £17.87k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 22 OCT 2017
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lincoln Baptist Church
9 Croft Street
Lincoln
LN2 5AX
- Phone:
- 01522575745
- Email:
- admin@lincolnbaptist.org.uk
- Website:
-
lincolnbaptist.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window