Accounts and annual returns CITIZENS FOR CHANGE

Charity number: 1131316
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 27 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 27 March 2025 361 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 30 June 2023 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 30 June 2023 456 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 20 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required