Financial history FRIENDS OF DUNNINGTON SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1130839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £10.34k £6.06k £6.50k £6.98k £6.02k
Total expenditure £3.35k £2.60k £4.29k £2.15k £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A