THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S EALING

Charity number: 1132598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St Paul's is a church in West London and operates a number of ministries to the local community and wider area. We have 4 services on Sundays and also run family life courses, children's and youth work, social transformation projects, and a range of other Christian events, conferences and ministries.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Ealing

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 November 2009: Previously excepted registration
  • 01 December 2015: Funds received from 1113555 THE SKYLIGHT CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • ST PAUL'S CHURCH EALING (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Benjamin Evans Trustee 30 June 2024
None on record
Andrew Mark Statham Trustee 20 May 2024
THE BERKSHIRE MEDICAL HERITAGE CENTRE
Received: On time
WEST LONDON COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Robert Daniel Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Alan Phillips Trustee 20 May 2024
None on record
Stephanie Ajayi Trustee 24 April 2023
AIM Qualifications and Assessment Group
Received: On time
Anusha Couttigane Trustee 25 April 2022
GURNELL GROVE COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time
Oscar Carshagen Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Paul Jason Pambakian Trustee 25 April 2022
None on record
Nicholas Andrew Taylor Trustee 19 October 2020
None on record
Aruliniyan Anban Nathaniel Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Gaurav Patel Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
VICTORIA ANNE READ Trustee
WEST LONDON COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £869.90k £760.19k £764.16k £751.76k £709.23k
Total expenditure £774.23k £686.01k £706.31k £727.31k £804.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.81k £2.58k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £705.29k £650.78k £647.04k £607.14k £527.81k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £36.44k £11.37k £8.39k £24.54k £32.42k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £321 £16 £89 £433 £2.44k
Income - Other £127.85k £98.03k £108.65k £119.64k £146.56k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £771.68k £683.42k £703.07k £722.13k £800.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.55k £2.58k £3.24k £2.78k £2.26k
Expenditure - Governance £4.53k £5.22k £5.19k £5.19k £5.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £146.24k £110.95k £162.37k £160.27k £142.06k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £2.41k £943

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £445.66k £432.07k £409.67k £375.14k £346.08k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £10.00k
Other assets £205.48k £245.13k £296.28k £326.58k £249.25k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £129.83k £81.70k £52.59k £23.93k £22.30k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 20 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 24 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 07 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 09 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ST. PAULS C OF E CHURCH
RIDLEY AVENUE
LONDON
W13 9XW
Phone:
02085799444