THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH LOWESTOFT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Christ Church provides: public worship open to all; pastoral visiting of the sick and bereaved; teaches Christianity in sermons, courses and small groups; religious assemblies in schools; youth clubs with a Christian ethos; promotes Christianity through events, meetings and literature; activities for senior citizens, parents and toddlers, and others; supports other charities in UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
94 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 18 August 2009: Previously excepted registration
- CHRIST CHURCH LOWESTOFT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan Mark Carter | Chair | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela May Waterson | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Elizabeth Stebbings | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Hicks | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David William Ryczanowski | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edward Philip George Timberlake | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Norman Cossey | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Roland Williams | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Claire Alison Williams | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Christopher Timberlake | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Pam Hicks | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CARELIEN MARTIN | Trustee | 26 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.80k | £187.18k | £119.68k | £181.72k | £230.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £138.32k | £138.10k | £143.40k | £149.90k | £139.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2024 | 113 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2024 | 113 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2021 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 May 2021 | 194 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church Office
Christ Church Square
Lowestoft
Suffolk
NR32 1XD
- Phone:
- 01502 584 557
- Email:
- admin@christ-church.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window