LEYTONSTONE MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the Leytonstone Muslim Community Centre is to run projects in conjunction with the local government for enhancing community cohesion and to help young children develop professional skills and understand true lslamic culture and values.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
- Redbridge
- Tower Hamlets
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 17 December 2009: Standard registration
- LMCC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mohammed Shofiqul Hoque Chowdhury | Trustee | 28 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
MOOSA LOONAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABBAS LIMBADA BSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHAHID MALEK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ARIF MASTER ACMA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IMRAN IQBAL PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.68k | £34.37k | £29.83k | £29.83k | £31.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.64k | £31.98k | £32.22k | £32.22k | £31.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 24 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 24 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 12 July 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED 09 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
A. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED. B TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING THE INCLUSION OF THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY AND RAISING AWARENESS OF DIFFERENT CULTURAL ISSUES ACROSS SCHOOLS, STATUTORY BODIES AND THE WIDER PUBLIC. C THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING EDUCATION AND INFORMATION ON ISLAM AND SOCIAL ISSUES FOR BOTH MUSLIMS AND NON-MUSLIMS. D TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH; 1 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2 PROVIDING EDUCATION, SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. E THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. F TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
L M C C CENTRE
CROSBY HOUSE
2A CARLTON ROAD
LONDON
E11 3AQ
- Phone:
- 02085397125
- Email:
- info@leytonstonemuslim.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window