Accounts and annual returns WARDROOM HMS COLLINGWOOD

Charity number: 1130657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 October 2024 250 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 October 2024 250 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window