THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WOOTTON BASSETT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The administration of the Parish Church of Royal Wootton Bassett
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 14 July 2009: Previously excepted registration
- ST. BARTHOLOMEW'S PCC, WOOTTON BASSETT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JANE DARWENT CURTIS | Chair | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Julie Astrid Laurence | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Robert Woollett | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ivor Timothy Davis | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Kay Ferry | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Katharine Emma Louise Minshall | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
JANICE MARY SMITH | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
ZACH MARTIN WATKINS co-opted | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Alexander Ten Broeek Oldfield | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Bennett | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Foxwell | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DAVID MEEK | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|||||
MARC COLPUS | Trustee | 18 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY SIMPKINS | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
RUTH SEXTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr KAREN NICHOLA MURRELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.84k | £96.24k | £97.46k | £119.95k | £187.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.99k | £139.06k | £151.11k | £205.18k | £207.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Bartholomew's Church
1 Church Street
Royal Wootton Bassett
SWINDON
Wiltshire
SN4 7BQ
- Phone:
- 01793853272
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window